This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/26/2021 at 16:28:07 (UTC).

CHACON AUTOS, LTD. VS LIFETIME TRANSMISSION,SALVADOR ALDANA RUIZ,MICHAEL MARTINEZ,ROY SELLS

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 CHACON AUTOS, LTD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LIFETIME TRANSMISSION,SALVADOR ALDANA RUIZ,MICHAEL MARTINEZ,ROY SELLS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6276

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chacon Autos, LTD.

Defendants

Roy Sells

Houston, TX 77015

Michael Martinez

Spring, TX 77388

Salvador Aldana Ruiz

Spring, TX 77388

Lifetime Transmission

20625 Louetta Glen Dr.

Spring, TX 77388

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hunt, Stephen G

888 Avenue D Ste B

Katy, TX 77493-2780

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice: NONSUITS ROY SELLS AND RELEASE BOND CC'S 6/29

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice: NONSUITS ROY SELLS AND RELEASE BOND CC'S 6/29

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice: NONSUITS ROY SELLS AND RELEASE BOND CC'S 6/29

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice: NONSUITS ROY SELLS AND RELEASE BOND CC'S 6/29

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice: NONSUITS ROY SELLS AND RELEASE BOND CC'S 6/29

DEFAULT JUDGMENT.pdf

Default Judgment and Notice: NONSUITS ROY SELLS AND RELEASE BOND CC'S 6/29

Notices Returned

Notices Returned

Cov - Hudspeth 3-30-21.pdf

Letter

Defs DOD Non Military.pdf

Affidavit: Non Military Reports

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE

POP.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Request for Injunction and Sequestration

Temporary Restraining Order.pdf

Proposed Order: Temporary Restraining Order

Order for Sequestration.pdf

Proposed Order

Cov - Hudspeth 3-20-21.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: and Writ of Sequestration to be issued

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Check Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice: NONSUITS ROY SELLS AND RELEASE BOND CC'S 6/29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: on Def J and Non-Suit and to Release Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: not set; incorrect date; S/W 6/11/21 can set for 6/29 @10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: CASH IN LIEU OF BOND $3,878.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit: Non Military Reports

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Request for Injunction and Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: 3/30 s/w Mr Hunt will set hearing for 4/6 @8:30------Temporary Restraining Order-S/W MR. HUNT 3/30 WILL FILE NEW ORDER WITH ADDRESS FOR PARTY AND BOND AMOUNT FILLED IN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER FOR SEQUESTRATION - L/M 3/30 NEED NON-MILITARY AFF. FOR MICHAEL AND ALDANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: and Writ of Sequestration to be issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lifetime Transmission is a litigant

Latest cases where Chacon Autos, Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hunt, Stephen G