This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 12:36:16 (UTC).

CENTERPOINT ENERGY HOUSTON ELECTRIC, LLC VS SHAKER TOUFIC ASSI D/B/A SAMWELL CABLE COMPANY,SHAKER TOUFIC ASSI

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CENTERPOINT ENERGY HOUSTON ELECTRIC, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHAKER TOUFIC ASSI D/B/A SAMWELL CABLE COMPANY,SHAKER TOUFIC ASSI. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6683

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CenterPoint Energy Houston Electric, LLC

C/O Jeffrey Wells Oppel, Oppel & Goldberg, Pllc 1010 Lamar, Suite 1420

Houston, TX 77002

Defendants

Shaker Toufic Assi D/B/A Samwell Cable Company

Spring, TX 77379

Shaker Toufic Assi

Spring, TX 77379

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Oppel, Jeffrey Wells

Attorney at OPPEL & GOLDBERG PLLC

1010 Lamar, Suite 1420

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Mtn Rule 106 Service SKAKER TOUFIC (2).pdf

Motion for Substituted Service

Mtn Rule 106 Service SKAKER TOUFIC ORDER (2).pdf

Proposed Order

Clerk Ltr re Rule 106 SKAKER TOUFIC (2).pdf

Rule 106 Citation to be Issued

Mtn Rule 106 Service SKAKER TOUFIC ORDER (2).pdf

Order for Rule 106

Rule 106 Citation

Rule 106 Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Order for Trial Setting - Unclaimed

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: MAIL TO ATTY

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: MAIL TO ATTY

Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition: and Request for Disclosures

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 106 Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 106 Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Order for Trial Setting - Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: MAIL TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: MAIL TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: and Request for Disclosures

    Read MoreRead Less