This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/29/2023 at 14:01:22 (UTC).

CEI GROUP INC VS. RICHARD TIJERIAN

Case Summary

On 07/30/2015 CEI GROUP INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICHARD TIJERIAN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MANPREET SINGH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-401

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MANPREET SINGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEI GROUP INC

Defendant

RICHARD TIJERIAN

Receiver

HENRY RADOFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEGRASSE, DONALD D.

Defendant Attorney

Radoff, Henry V

 

Court Documents

Order Granted

Order Granted: ORDER CLOSING RECEIVERSHIP Film code number CCCL-2015-362733

Notice of Submission

Notice of Submission: PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO CLOSE RECEIVERSHIP Film code number CCCL-2015-329553

Application

Application: TO CLOSE RECEIVERSHIP Film code number CCCL-2015-362068

Notice of Submission

Notice of Submission: L/V W/ LIDIA ON 9-23-15 WRONG TIME Film code number CCCL-2015-326605

Answer

Answer: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE -REGIONS BANK Film code number CCCL-2015-325548

Oath

Oath: OF RECEIVER Film code number CCCL-2015-316008

Bond of Receiver

Bond of Receiver

Turnover Agreed Order

Turnover Agreed Order: HENRY RODOFF Film code number CCCL-2015-286481

Notice of Submission

Notice of Submission: PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TURNOVER Film code number CCCL-2015-261336

All Other Cases Added (OCA)

All Other Cases Added (OCA)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granted: ORDER CLOSING RECEIVERSHIP Film code number CCCL-2015-362733

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission: PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO CLOSE RECEIVERSHIP Film code number CCCL-2015-329553

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee: CORRECTED NOTICE OF SUBMISSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication: TO CLOSE RECEIVERSHIP Film code number CCCL-2015-362068

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission: L/V W/ LIDIA ON 9-23-15 WRONG TIME Film code number CCCL-2015-326605

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE -REGIONS BANK Film code number CCCL-2015-325548

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee: NOTICE OF SUBMISSION, APPLICATION TO CLOSE RECEIVERSHIP, AND ORDER CLOSING RECEIVERSHIP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath: OF RECEIVER Film code number CCCL-2015-316008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2015
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee: BOND OF RECEIVER, OATH OF RECEIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketAttorney Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTurnover Agreed Order: HENRY RODOFF Film code number CCCL-2015-286481

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketAttorney Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission: PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TURNOVER Film code number CCCL-2015-261336

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketApplication for Turnover

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • DocketRECEIVABLE GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAll Other Cases Added (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less