This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 14:11:56 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS MARIA N DOMINGUEZ

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA N DOMINGUEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6685

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry Spv I, Llc

Defendant

Maria N Dominguez

Houston, TX 77096-1906

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMAROZZI, KAITLIN

Attorney at JAVITCH BLOCK LLC

275 W. Campbell, Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

 

Court Documents

1767734-MDJ.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

1767734-DEFAULT JUDGMENT.pdf

Proposed Order

1767734-DEFAULT JUDGMENT.pdf

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC-DALLAS

JavitchBlock_1767734_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

JavitchBlock_1767734_let_eABC.pdf

Letter: Cover Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC-DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less