This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/25/2023 at 21:02:00 (UTC).

ALLSTATE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS JOSE PENA CESPEDES

Case Summary

On 05/10/2023 ALLSTATE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE PENA CESPEDES. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MANPREET SINGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4453

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MANPREET SINGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLSTATE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

JOSE PENA CESPEDES

Not Classified By Court

Todd C Litton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miller, Faith D.

Defendant Attorney

GALVIN, SONJA R.

 

Court Documents

SIGNED 166 Petition_Rule 193_7 Notc_L 0628075715.1 (1).pdf

eFile Original Petition: with Issuance Request

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: P/U CABINET CT. 4

Answer

Answer: Juan Pena

Defendant's Original Answer-Cespedes.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer

1204453 Service Affidavit and Citation on Jose Pena Cespedes.pdf

Return of Service

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Defendant's Amended Answer.pdf

Amended Answer: Request for Disclosure

201 Cert of Disc_L 0628075715.1- SIGNED.pdf

Certificate of Written Discovery

ENTIRE BRA- 0628075715.1.pdf

Business Records Affidavit: With Exhibits

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBusiness Records Affidavit: With Exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer: Request for Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Juan Pena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: P/U CABINET CT. 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: with Issuance Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less