This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/25/2023 at 21:42:24 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE N.A. VS STEVEN A. CASILLAS WINTERS

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 CAPITAL ONE N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEVEN A CASILLAS WINTERS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3794

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE N.A.

Defendant

STEVEN A. CASILLAS WINTERS

Houston, TX 77084

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto, Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mashigian, Shelby L.

Attorney at Scott & Associates, P.C.

P.O.Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant Attorney

Schafer, Daniel M.

Attorney at Schafer Law Firm, P.C.

10730 Potranco Rd., Ste. 122-675

San Antonio, TX 78251

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT-TX 2208239-189058

eFile Original Petition: with issuance request

NON_MILITARY_DECLARATION-TX 2208239-189058

eFile Original Petition: with issuance request

Cover Letter - TX 2208239-189058

eFile Original Petition: with issuance request

C1-TX-2208239-189058_Complaint-Nvb0bJ4718313.pdf

eFile Original Petition: with issuance request

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O PROOF

Answer.pdf

Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O PROOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: with issuance request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dispute Resolution Center is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHAFER, DANIELMICHAEL