Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/12/2021 at 15:04:59 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. VS MARY A POTTER

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARY A POTTER. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5776

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (usa) N.a.

Defendant

Mary A Potter

Kingwood, TX 77345

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooper, Matthew W

P.O. Box 115220

Carollton, TX 75011

 

Court Documents

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment---Sent to Judge

Agreed Judgment and Notice

1827282.pdf

Proposed Order: Agreed Judgment

Lead_ProofofServiceorNonService_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

ScottParnell_1827282_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

ScottParnell_1827282_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - SEATTLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - SEATTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper