Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/18/2021 at 15:14:09 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. VS LARAUN LANE,LANE TRANSPORTATION LLC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LARAUN LANE,LANE TRANSPORTATION LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5787

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (usa) N.a.

Defendants

Lane Transportation LLC

3831 Mistissin Ln

Houston, TX 77053

Laraun Lane

Houston, TX 77053

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooper, Matthew W

P.O. Box 115220

Carollton, TX 75011

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer: Defendant's Answer

Civil Answer.pdf

Answer: Civil Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Lead_ProofofServiceorNonService_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

ScottParnell_1827110_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

ScottParnell_1827110_let_eABC.pdf

Letter: Cover Letter

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: ABC

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Civil Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper