This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 12/08/2022 at 07:05:27 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS JOSE F PEREZ

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSE F PEREZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIRYEA AYALA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9980

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIRYEA AYALA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

JOSE F PEREZ

Katy, TX 77449-2493

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

Dispute Resolution Center, Harris County Annex 21

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moss, Michael Allen

Attorney at Moss Law Firm, P.C.

P.O. Box 65020

Lubbock, TX 79464

 

Court Documents

AX40A22801006CL.PDF

Citation to Be Issued: Service Copies Unpaid

AX40A22801006.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O PCP

answ request- perez.pdf

Request: for copy of answer

AX02A22801006.PDF

Return of Service

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Answer

Answer

374229 Perez - P's CWD.PDF

Certificate of Written Discovery

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: for copy of answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O PCP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: Service Copies Unpaid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dispute Resolution Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A Moss