This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/29/2020 at 23:34:24 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. VS DESIRE P. YOUNG

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DESIRE P YOUNG. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6603

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (usa) N.a.

Defendant

Desire P. Young

Houston, TX 77024

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baxter, Kyla

Attorney at P.O

Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

 

Court Documents

Cover Letter of Motion for Continuance - Desire Young.pdf

Letter

Motion for Continuance - Desire Young.pdf

Motion for Continuance: Motion for Continuance

Order of Motion for Continuance - Desire Young.pdf

Proposed Order: Order of Motion for Continuance

MFC - YOUNG.pdf

Motion for Continuance

ORDER FOR MFC - YOUNG.pdf

Proposed Order

Worksheet

Worksheet: DISPUTE RESOLUTION CENTER

Answer

Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC DALLAS

ScottParnell_1596231_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

ScottParnell_1596231_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance: Motion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order of Motion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWorksheet: DISPUTE RESOLUTION CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less