This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 12/02/2021 at 15:01:45 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE VS NICKINO R. HARRIS

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NICKINO R HARRIS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5083

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Auto Finance

Defendant

Nickino R. Harris

Houston, TX 77054

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANNER , RICHARD DWAYNE

6688 North Central Expressway Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

Harris - Proposed Order.pdf

Proposed Order: need new order with bond amount filled in; S/W Linda 9/16/21

Harris - Original Petition and Application for Writ.pdf

eFile Original Petition: and Application for Writ of Sequestration**OWES ISSUE & COPY FEES**

Harris Ex. 1.pdf

eFile Original Petition: and Application for Writ of Sequestration**OWES ISSUE & COPY FEES**

Harris Ex. 2.pdf

eFile Original Petition: and Application for Writ of Sequestration**OWES ISSUE & COPY FEES**

Harris Ex. 3.pdf

eFile Original Petition: and Application for Writ of Sequestration**OWES ISSUE & COPY FEES**

H0163-1.pdf

Request: for Service of Writ of Sequestration

Ltr Court Request for Writ_ Service_ En Original Bond (Harris)(18212553.1).pdf

Writ of Sequestration Before Judgment to be Issued: & Request for Copy of Order **OWES COPY FEES/ NO AFFIDAVIT FOR SEQUESTRATION ON FILE/ NO CONSTABLE FEES $150**

Order for Writ of Sequestration - to Judge

Order for Sequestration

Order for Issuance of Writ of Sequestration

Proposed Order: Proposed Order for Issuance of Writ of Sequestration

Bond

Bond: APPROVED BOND

Writ of Sequestration

Writ of Sequestration Issued

Ltr Court request copy of Petition for service with writ (Harris)(18534580.1).pdf

Request: Payment for Service Copy

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Sequestration Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: Payment for Service Copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBond: APPROVED BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Sequestration Before Judgment to be Issued: & Request for Copy of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: for Service of Writ of Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Proposed Order for Issuance of Writ of Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: and Application for Writ of Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANNER RICHARD DWAYNE