This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 12/02/2021 at 15:02:00 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE VS MAURO R. GUTIERREZ,ALMA D. GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAURO R GUTIERREZ,ALMA D GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5085

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Auto Finance

Defendants

Mauro R. Gutierrez

Channelview, TX 77530-4763

Alma D. Gutierrez

Channelview, TX 77530-4763

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANNER , RICHARD DWAYNE

6688 North Central Expressway Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

Gutierrez - Proposed Order.pdf

Proposed Order

Gutierrez - Original Petition and Application for Writ.pdf

eFile Original Petition: and Application for Writ of Sequestration

Gutierrez Ex. 1.pdf

eFile Original Petition: and Application for Writ of Sequestration

Gutierrez Ex. 2.pdf

eFile Original Petition: and Application for Writ of Sequestration

Gutierrez Ex. 3.pdf

eFile Original Petition: and Application for Writ of Sequestration

Gutierrez - Order.pdf

Proposed Order: sequestration order---sent to judge

Order for Sequestration---sent to judge

Order for Sequestration

Writ of Sequestration

Writ of Sequestration Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

Writ of Sequestration

Writ of Sequestration Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

Bond

Bond: VERIFIED

Request for Issuance of Writ and Service

Writ of Sequestration Before Judgment to be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBond: VERIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Sequestration Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Sequestration Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Sequestration Before Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: sequestration order---sent to judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: and Application for Writ of Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE AUTO FINANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANNER RICHARD DWAYNE