This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/11/2020 at 15:11:38 (UTC).

CAMILLO PROPERTIES, LTD VS ICY SHERELLE COBBS,ALL OTHER OCCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CAMILLO PROPERTIES, LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ICY SHERELLE COBBS,ALL OTHER OCCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6551

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CamilloProperties, Ltd

C/O Eddie Dean Young 6300 La Calma Dr, Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Camillo Properties, Ltd

C/O Eddie Dean Young 6300 La Calma Dr, Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendants

All Other Occcupants

Houston, TX 77014

Icy Sherelle Cobbs

Houston, TX 77014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nguyen, James V

5051 Westheimer Rd., Ste 1200

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Nonsuit (3).pdf

Motion for Non-Suit

Order (5).pdf

Proposed Order

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Order (5).pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Camillo Cobbs NOA.pdf

Notice of Appearance

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Pauper's Eviction

Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY ICY S COBBS

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

JP Notice

JP Notice: Nationwide Eviction

JP Notice

JP Notice: Writ of Possession

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPauper's Eviction: FILED BY ICY S COBBS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: Nationwide Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less