This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/11/2020 at 18:30:30 (UTC).

CAMILLO A-1 PROPERTY OWNER, LLC VS ROBERT MARSH,PRISCILLA L MARSH,ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 CAMILLO A-1 PROPERTY OWNER, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROBERT MARSH,PRISCILLA L MARSH,ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6623

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Camillo A-1 Property Owner, LLC

C/O Eddie Dean Young 6300 La Calma Dr, Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendants

All Other Occupants

Houston, TX 77073

Priscilla L Marsh

Houston, TX 77073

Robert Marsh

Houston, TX 77073

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nguyen, James V

5051 Westheimer Rd., Ste 1200

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Order to Withdraw Funds

Order to Withdraw Funds

Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice- Marsh.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: Nonsuit Without Prejudice

Order to Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice- Marsh.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER FOR NON SUIT

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Order to Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice- Marsh.pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Pauper's Eviction

Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY ROBER MARSH

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

Camillo Marsh NOA.pdf

Notice of Appearance

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP APPEAL 194100439762 RECEIPT #2019-784 $1,525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: Nonsuit Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER FOR NON SUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPauper's Eviction: FILED BY ROBER MARSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less