This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/17/2017 at 16:49:28 (UTC).

BRETT HARRIS VS. DAVID M ROBERTSON ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2016 BRETT HARRIS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAVID M ROBERTSON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLYDE LEUCHTAG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3012

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CLYDE LEUCHTAG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRETT HARRIS

Defendants

LESLIE SALVA

CAROLYN A ROBERTSON

MANUEL SALVA

KEITH DONATI

DAVID M ROBERTSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Donati, Keith S

Attorney at DONATI BRASHEAR LAW FIRM

410 W. Grand Parkway S., Ste. 104

Katy, TX 77494

 

Court Documents

Contest

Contest: COUNTY CLERKS CONTEST OF AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCE TEXAS RULE OF CIVIL PRODEDURE 145 Film code number CCCL-2016-96558

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service

Citation Issued

Citation Issued

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 2-4-16 APPEARANCE DATE 2-29-16 Film code number CCCL-2016-48088

Notice of Submission

Notice of Submission: NOT SET Film code number CCCL-2016-290998

Letter

Letter: FROM HARRISON GREGG JR. Film code number CCCL-2016-253241

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: unclaimed order of dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: DEFENDANTS' NO EVIDENCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SEPTEMBER 15, 2016 Film code number CCCL-2016-292494

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee: NOTICE OF ORAL HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment: NO EVIDENCE Film code number CCCL-2016-291081

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketConversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketConversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketPro Se Set

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketJury Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY Film code number CCCL-2016-36658

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketRECEIVABLE GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Initiation Event (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donati, Keith S