This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/02/2022 at 20:08:14 (UTC).

BRENDA KUZMA VS LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 BRENDA KUZMA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6859

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda Kuzma

Defendant

Landmark Industries Energy, LLC

C/O Registered Agent, J Kent Brotherton, 11111 Wilcrest Green, Suite 100

Houston, TX 77042

Not Classified By Court

John Vong

Houston, TX 77042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARRIGAN, STEPHEN P.

Attorney at CARRIGAN & ANDERSON, PLLC

101 N. Shoreline Blvd., Suite 420

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorney

Zito, Nicholas E

Attorney at RAMEY CHANDLER MCKINLEY & ZITO

750 Bering, #600

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

836069EF.pdf

Deposition: Reporter's Certification to the Oral Videotaped Zoom Deposition of Brenda Kuzma

29729-3_Kuzma, Brenda.pdf

Deposition: Transcript Certificate $375.20

29729-5_Kuzma, Brenda.pdf

Deposition: Deposition Transcript Certificate $364.00

Plaintiff's 2nd Amd Petition.pdf

Amended Petition: Second Amended Petition

29729-1_Kuzma, Brenda.pdf

Deposition: Deposition Transcript Certificate $344.00

29729-6_Kuzma, Brenda.pdf

Deposition: Deposition Transcript Certificate $812.60

Kuzma - Harris County Court Clerk re atty vacation.pdf

Notice: Attorney Vacation Letter

Joint Agreed Mtn for Continuance.pdf

Motion for Continuance: Agreed Motion for Continuance

Order.pdf

Proposed Order

AX02A21B01308.pdf

Return of Service

Defendant's Original Answer.pdf

Answer

Defendant's Jury Demand.pdf

Jury Fee

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Plaintiff's OP.pdf

eFile Original Petition: & CITATION TO BE ISSUED

Process Request.pdf

eFile Original Petition: & CITATION TO BE ISSUED

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: P/U CABINET PCP

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposition: Reporter's Certification to the Oral Videotaped Zoom Deposition of Brenda Kuzma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: Second Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposition: Deposition Transcript Certificate $364.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposition: Transcript Certificate $375.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposition: Deposition Transcript Certificate $344.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposition: Deposition Transcript Certificate $812.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance: Agreed Motion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Attorney Vacation Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Letter from Trial Coordinator

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposition: Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeposition: Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: & CITATION TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: P/U CABINET PCP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDMARK INDUSTRIES ENERGY LLC (D/B/A TIMEWISE SHELL AND D/B/A is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZITO, NICHOLAS E.