This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 20:52:32 (UTC).

BRE KENWOOD MF PROPERTY OWNER LP VS NANCY CARLSEN

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BRE KENWOOD MF PROPERTY OWNER LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NANCY CARLSEN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6545

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRE Kenwood MF Property Owner LP

C/O Jessica Tennis 2000 Westborough Dr

Katy, TX 77449

Defendant

Nancy Carlsen

Katy, TX 77449

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOURNIER, SCOTT H

3311 Richmond Ave. Suite 305

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Order to Withdraw Funds

Order to Withdraw Funds

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Exhibits

Exhibits: FROM TRIAL

NOA.pdf

Notice of Appearance

CLKA.pdf

Certificate: of Last Known Address

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Docket Sheet

JP Docket Sheet

JP Request for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal: #1

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal: #2

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

JP Receipts

JP Receipts: $890.00

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Check Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits: FROM TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP APPEAL # 195200438508 RECEIPT # 2019-529 $ 890.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate: of Last Known Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit: Supplemental Servicemembers' Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Order for Trial Setting _ Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Docket Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Request for Appeal: #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Request for Appeal: #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Receipts: $890.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less