Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/23/2021 at 21:11:48 (UTC).

BOTTOM LINE EQUIPMENT, LLC VS MC SITE PREP AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC,MARIA CURIEL

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 BOTTOM LINE EQUIPMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MC SITE PREP AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC,MARIA CURIEL. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4213

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bottom Line Equipment, LLC

Defendants

Maria Curiel

Houston, TX 77056

MC Site Prep and Construction, LLC

C/O Maria Curiel 3300 Sage Rd Apt 9205

Houston, TX 77056

Not Classified By Court

DONALD SEPOLIO

Houston, TX 77006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHEY, BILL

Attorney at GRIFFIN & MATTHEWS

400 Neches At Crockett

Beaumont, TX 77701

Defendant Attorney

REYES JR, FRUMENCIO

Attorney at REYES & REYES-CASTILLO, P.C.

3213 Houston Ave

Houston, TX 77009

 

Court Documents

citations.issue.let 06.29.2020.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: Unserved

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: Unserved

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY BILL RICHEY - SECT. OF STATE

Order for Substituted Service.pdf

Order for Rule 106

Notice of Subsmission - Continuance.pdf

Notice of Submission

Plaintiff's Unopposed Mtn for Continuance.pdf

Motion for Continuance

Order Granting Unopposed Mtn for Continuance.pdf

Proposed Order: Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Continuance

continuance.filing.let 10.26.2020.pdf

Letter

Notice of Hearing.pdf

Notice of Hearing: on Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice.filing.let 11.17.2020.pdf

Letter

Summary Judgment and Notice

Summary Judgment and Notice

Summary Judgment and Notice

Summary Judgment and Notice

PLAINTIFFS SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO JUDGE.pdf

Summary Judgment and Notice

petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

petition.let 04.03.2020.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummary Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance: Plaintiff's Firt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY BILL RICHEY - SECT. OF STATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bottom Line Equipment, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHEY, BILL