This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 10/10/2021 at 14:54:41 (UTC).

BLANCA ENAMORADO CASTRO VS LETICIA AMBRIZ HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 BLANCA ENAMORADO CASTRO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LETICIA AMBRIZ HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2425

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blanca Enamorado Castro

Defendant

Leticia Ambriz Hernandez

Houston, TX 77042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ellis, Cameron Blake

Attorney at Ellis & Thomas, PLLC

7575 San Felipe, Suite 333

Houston, TX 77063

Defendant Attorney

ARNOLD, STEVEN

Attorney at Arnold & Taylor PLLC

4950 Heathrow Forest Parkway, Suite 580

Houston, TX 77032

 

Court Documents

Defendant's Original Answer

Answer: DEFENDANT S ORIGINAL ANSWER (Jury Fee Paid)

5949981 Leticia Ambriz Hernandez AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY CAMERION ELLIS

Civil Process Request Form - Hernandez.pdf

eFile Original Petition: & CITATION TO BE ISSUED

Plaintiffs' Original Petition - MVA.pdf

eFile Original Petition: & CITATION TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: DEFENDANT S ORIGINAL ANSWER (Jury Fee Paid)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY CAMERION ELLIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: & CITATION TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less