This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/27/2022 at 15:07:54 (UTC).

BLADE FUNDING INC VS CLAREMONT RESTAURANT GROUP LLC ,SAGEBRUSH OF UNCC, LLC,JP MANAGEMENT ENTERPRISES LLC,COUNTRYSIDE BBQ & CHICKEN, LLC,JIMMIE LEE PETERSON,QUALITY FOODS, INC,QUALITY FOODS, INC,COUNTRYSIDE BBQ & CHICKEN, LLC,JP MANAGEMENT ENTERPRISE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 BLADE FUNDING INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLAREMONT RESTAURANT GROUP LLC ,SAGEBRUSH OF UNCC, LLC,JP MANAGEMENT ENTERPRISES LLC,COUNTRYSIDE BBQ CHICKEN, LLC,JIMMIE LEE PETERSON,QUALITY FOODS, INC,QUALITY FOODS, INC,COUNTRYSIDE BBQ CHICKEN, LLC,JP MANAGEMENT ENTERPRISE. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9963

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor

BLADE FUNDING INC

Defendants

CLAREMONT RESTAURANT GROUP LLC

516 River Hwy Ste D Pmb

Mooresville, NC 28117

SAGEBRUSH OF UNCC, LLC

516 River Hwy Ste D Pmb

Mooresville, NC 28117

JP MANAGEMENT ENTERPRISES LLC

516 River Hwy Ste D Pmb

Moorsville, NC 28117

COUNTRYSIDE BBQ & CHICKEN, LLC

516 River Hwy Ste D Pmb

Mooresville, NC 28117

JIMMIE LEE PETERSON

Moorsville, NC 28117

QUALITY FOODS, INC

516 River Hwy Ste D Pmb

Mooresville, NC 28117

Garnishee

Truist Bank

C/O Corporation Service Company, 211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor Attorney

Regent, Anh H

Attorney at Regent & Associates

500 Lovett Blvd. Ste. 225

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorney

PROBUS JR, MICHAEL M

Attorney at LAW OFC OF MICHAEL A WASH

1701 Directors Blvd Suite 290

Austin, TX 78744

 

Court Documents

Suggestion of Bankruptcy.pdf

Bankruptcy

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Order of Dismissal--sent to judge

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Order for Trial Setting - Unclaimed

Notice of non-suit Garnishment-Claremont Restaurants.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: Notice of Non-Suit and Motion to Dismiss Writ of Garnishment as to Garnishee Truist Bank--801

Defendants' Original Answer.pdf

Answer: Defendants' Original Answer

Notice of Non-Suit - Claremont Restaurant Group.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: & Dismissal of all Claims

Order of Dismissal - Claremont Restaurant Group.pdf

Proposed Order: Order of Dismissal

Lawsuit - Claremont Restaurant.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Agreed Judgment_signed - Claremont Restaurant.pdf

Proposed Order: Agreed Judgment***sent to judge

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

AJ--sent to judge

Agreed Judgment and Notice

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Order for Trial Setting - Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendants' Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: & Dismissal of all Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: Notice of Non-Suit and Motion to Dismiss Writ of Garnishment as to Garnishee Truist Bank--801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice--801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Transfer Venue: Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue***Must be set call the court for dates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for New Trial: ***Must be set call the court for dates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Reinstate (OCA): The Agreed Judgment signe don 1-13-22 is hereby vacated on 2-13-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: agreed order vacating judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication: See 801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: for Exemplified Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Agreed Judgment***sent to judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLADE FUNDING, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROBUS MICHAEL M.