Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/07/2021 at 14:35:20 (UTC).

BIG CITY INVESTMENTS, LLC VS ADRIAN TRUJILLO

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 BIG CITY INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ADRIAN TRUJILLO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8998

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Big City Investments, LLC

Defendant

Adrian Trujillo

Houston, TX 77022

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHEAT, JOE F.

4544 Post Oak Place Dr. Suite 350

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

Big City Investments Exhibit List

Exhibit List

Exhibits to Big City Investments Exhibit List

Exhibit List

Letter from Justice of the Peace Court

Letter from Justice of the Peace Court: FROM ANDRIAN TRUJILLO

Paid Forcible

Paid Forcible: FILED AND PAID BY ADRIAN TRUJILLO

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

(Eviction) Declaration

(Eviction) Declaration

JP Notice

JP Notice: Supplement to Petition for Eviction from Residential Premises

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Notice of Hearing

JP Notice of Hearing: #2 Telephonic for Eviction

JP Notice of Hearing

JP Notice of Hearing: #2 Telephonic for Eviction

JP Judgment

JP Judgment: Signed

JP Order

JP Order: #2 ON CDC DECLARATION

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

Cash Bond

Cash Bond

Paid Debt Letter

Paid Debt Letter

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: JP BOND $500.00 201100330310 RECEIPT # 00403692

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter from Justice of the Peace Court: FROM ANDRIAN TRUJILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(Eviction) Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid Forcible: FILED AND PAID BY ADRIAN TRUJILLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: Supplement to Petition for Eviction from Residential Premises

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerification: Of Compliance With Sections 4023 and 4024 of the Cares Act, the CDC Order and the 27th Emergency Order of the Texas Supreme Court

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter from Justice of the Peace Court: #3 From Joe Wheat

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Hearing: #2 Telephonic for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Hearing: #2 Telephonic for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Order: #2 ON CDC DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCash Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid Debt Letter

    Read MoreRead Less