This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 17:04:16 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. VS WILMA J HUNTER

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILMA J HUNTER. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6557

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America N.a.

Defendant

Wilma J Hunter

Houston, TX 77021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooper, Matthew W

P.O. Box 115220

Carollton, TX 75011

 

Court Documents

1559148_Hunter_MDJ.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

1559148_Hunter_DJ.pdf

Proposed Order

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

ScottParnell_1559148_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

ScottParnell_1559148_let_eABC.pdf

Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less