This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/03/2020 at 14:57:06 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA N.A. VS TONY O POUNDS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BANK OF AMERICA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TONY O POUNDS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6559

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America N.a.

Defendant

Tony O Pounds

Austin, TX 78701

Not Classified By Court

MICHAEL A HAWASH

Houston, TX 77019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cooper, Matthew W

P.O. Box 115220

Carollton, TX 75011

Defendant Attorney

SIMMONS, ANDERSON MCLAY

Attorney at Law Office of Anderson M. Simmons PC

702 Rio Grande

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

1580329_AJ_Pounds.pdf

Proposed Order

1580329_AL_Pounds.pdf

Proposed Order

1580329_AJ_Pounds.pdf

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

answer bank of america.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC-DALLAS

ScottParnell_1580329_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

ScottParnell_1580329_let_eABC.pdf

Letter

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC-DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less