This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 12:27:35 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS JERRY R CHAFFIN

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JERRY R CHAFFIN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6678

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

JERRY R CHAFFIN

Houston, TX 77040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McBride, Travis W

Attorney at Couch, Conville & Blitt

3501 N. Causeway, Ste 800

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

Pages from A1906220 letter.pdf

Letter: LETTER TO MOTION TO RETAIN

Pages from A1906220 Motion to retain.pdf

Motion to Retain

A1906220 order to retain.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER TO RETAIN

5506278-36556563-AUB7Djk0gZicQat.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Adms Disc Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5506278-36274001-RYMEzuFnDMYN452.pdf

eFile Original Petition

5506278-36274072-jKbQYji0RtXfjMd.pdf

Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: LETTER TO MOTION TO RETAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Retain

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER TO RETAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Adms Disc Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less