This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/05/2020 at 00:54:42 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS ELEPHANTA JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELEPHANTA JOSEPH. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6681

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

ELEPHANTA JOSEPH

Seabrook, TX 77586

Not Classified By Court

DENISE E HEWITT PETERSON

Houston, TX 77065

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McBride, Travis W

Attorney at Couch, Conville & Blitt

3501 N. Causeway, Ste 800

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant Attorney

Niba, Jacqueline

Attorney at National Litigation Law Group

2401 Northwest Twenty-Third Street Ste 42

Lahoma, OK 73107

 

Court Documents

Pages from A1906187 letter.pdf

Letter

Pages from A1906187 motion.pdf

Motion to Retain

A1906187 MTR order.pdf

Proposed Order

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Notices Returned

Notices Returned

Pages from A1906187 letter.pdf

Letter: LETTER TO AGREED JUDGMENT

Binder1 AJ A1906187.pdf

Proposed Order: AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

5506252-36702663-7VfH53eH15M37mm.pdf

Return of Service

Elephanta Joseph-Bank Of America, N.A.-4067 Answer.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5506252-36273750-psyn0wkgKGUxaU6.pdf

eFile Original Petition

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: LETTER TO AGREED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: AGREED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Retain

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less