This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 06:07:22 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS CLAUDIA ROSALES

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLAUDIA ROSALES. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6610

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

CLAUDIA ROSALES

Seabrook, TX 77586-4100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REDMAN, SHAWN ROBERT

6200 Savoy, Suite 440

Houston, TX 77036

 

Court Documents

Pages from T1908044 DWOP letter.pdf

Letter: LETTER TO MOTION TO DISMISS

Pages from T1908044 DWOP motion.pdf

Motion to Dismiss: MOTION TO DISMISS

Pages from T1908044 DWOP order.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER TO DISMISS

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NS - sent to Judge

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

5499169-36746510-bQpsGJOk77KwQl2.pdf

Citation Returned

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ

5499169.pdf

eFile Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: LETTER TO MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less