This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/03/2020 at 15:29:32 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS CHANTEE HALE

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHANTEE HALE. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6568

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America, N.a.

Defendant

Chantee Hale

Houston, TX 77071

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETERSON, ERIC S

275 W. Campbell Suite 312

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant Attorney

CASTRO, MICHAEL RENAN

Attorney at Law Office of Michael R. Castro, PLLC

445 E Fm 1382, Suite 3676

Cedar Hill, TX 75104

 

Court Documents

Chantee Hale MFC.pdf

Motion for Continuance

Chantee Hale Proposed Order.pdf

Motion for Continuance

Chantee Hale Proposed Order.pdf

Order for Continuance

1759946 Notice.pdf

Notice of Trial From Party

1759946 Order.PDF

Order Granted: Order Setting Trial

1759946 BRA.PDF

Business Records Affidavit: Notice of filing business records affidavit

1759946 Req.pdf

Request: Request for trial setting

1759946 Order.PDF

Proposed Order: Order setting trial

Original Answer.pdf

Answer: Original Answer

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

JavitchBlock_1759946_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

JavitchBlock_1759946_let_eABC.pdf

Letter: Cover Letter

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Trial From Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granted: Order Setting Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: Request for trial setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order setting trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBusiness Records Affidavit: Notice of filing business records affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC LEGAL - DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less