This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/03/2020 at 14:57:32 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS ALEXANDRIA TAINA BOUDHIM

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEXANDRIA TAINA BOUDHIM. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6608

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

ALEXANDRIA TAINA BOUDHIM

Houston, TX 77065-1363

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REDMAN, SHAWN ROBERT

6200 Savoy, Suite 440

Houston, TX 77036

 

Court Documents

T1908129.pdf

Letter

20200128162735030.pdf

Motion to Dismiss

20200128162738224.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER TO DISMISS

20200128162738224.pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

5497251-36458094-oKDoNRpFbiFIgeF.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Adms Disc Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

5497251.pdf

eFile Original Petition: ***OWES COPY FEES***

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Adms Disc Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less