This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/23/2023 at 09:56:53 (UTC).

BADGER DAYLIGHTING CORP. VS PROLINE ENERGY RESOURCES INC.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 BADGER DAYLIGHTING CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROLINE ENERGY RESOURCES INC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9953

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BADGER DAYLIGHTING CORP.

Defendant

PROLINE ENERGY RESOURCES INC.

C/O Capitol Corporate Services Inc, 206 E 9Th St Ste 1300

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Totz, Jon D.

Attorney at Totz, Ellison & Totz, P.C.

2211 Norfolk, Suite 510

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: LOOP LEGAL

104961 Clerk letter.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

104961 Case Info Sheet.pdf

Civil Case Information Sheet

104961 Plaintiff's Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

104961 Service Return.pdf

Return of Service: Service Return

104961-rule 11 agreement.pdf

Rule 11 Agreement

Nonsuit---Sent to Judge

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

104961 Clerk letter.pdf

Letter

104961 Order.pdf

Proposed Order: Dismiss

104961-MOTION TO DISMISS.pdf

Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: Service Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: LOOP LEGAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Badger Daylighting Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOTZ, JON D