This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/02/2020 at 02:10:17 (UTC).

AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM, LLC VS PHILLIP OSIER

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PHILLIP OSIER. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6606

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Avis Rent A Car System, LLC

Defendant

Phillip Osier

Lawrenceville, GA 30043

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott, Thomas H

Attorney at BASHAM & SCOTT

Po Box 450676

Houston, TX 77245

 

Court Documents

Motion on 106.pdf

Motion for Substituted Service

Order on 106.pdf

Proposed Order

CT 02 106.pdf

Letter

Order on 106.pdf

Order for Rule 106: Granted

PHILLIP OSIER 1146606.pdf

Return of Service

MDJ.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

Order on MDJ.pdf

Proposed Order

CT 03 MDJ.pdf

Letter

Default Judgment

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Adms Disc Citation Issued: HOLD FOR P/I LDM

POP&RFAs.pdf

eFile Original Petition

CT 01 POP&RFAs.pdf

Letter

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Adms Disc Citation Issued: HOLD FOR P/I LDM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less