This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/06/2020 at 15:32:49 (UTC).

AUDLEY SAMUEL ANDERSON VS JERRY RYAN MOSLEY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 AUDLEY SAMUEL ANDERSON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JERRY RYAN MOSLEY. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6566

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Audley Samuel Anderson

Houston, TX 77079

Defendant

Jerry Ryan Mosley

Houston, TX 77079

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA, ERNESTO, III

Attorney at The Law Office of Ernie Garcia

2626 S Loop W Suite 625

Houston, TX 77054

 

Court Documents

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Pauper's Eviction

Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY JERRY RYAN MOSLEY

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Military Status Affidavit

Civil Case Information Sheet

Civil Case Information Sheet

JP Receipts

JP Receipts: $121.00

JP Citation

JP Citation

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

Writ of Possession on Property (Court Judgment)

Writ of Property Possession Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

Writ of Possession to be Issued

Writ of Possession to be Issued

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Notice of Appearance.pdf

Notice of Appearance

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Receipts

JP Receipts: $1,650.00

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Property Possession Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Receipts: $1,650.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Docket Sheet: #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Receipts: $121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY JERRY RYAN MOSLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.