Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 06:56:39 (UTC).

ANYA LUCAS ET AL. VS. OSCAR ORTIZ ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2014 ANYA LUCAS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against OSCAR ORTIZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA STOREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4237

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LINDA STOREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LUCAS TYGER

Kingwood, TX 77339

LUCAS ANYA

Kingwood, TX 77339

ANYA LUCAS

Kingwood, TX 77339

TYGER LUCAS

Kingwood, TX 77339

Defendants

NGO LONG

Kingwood, TX 77345

ORTIZ OSCAR

ORTIZ LISSELOTTE

LONG NGO

Kingwood, TX 77345

LISSELOTTE ORTIZ

OSCAR ORTIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MELAMED RICHARD

Attorney at HARBERG HUVARD JACOBS WADLER, LLP

2100 West Loop South, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77027

MELAMED, RICHARD

2100 West Loop South, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Receipts

JP Receipts

JP Citation

JP Citation: OSCAR ORTIZ Film code number CCCL-2014-63529

JP Citation

JP Citation: LISSELOTTE ORTIZ Film code number CCCL-2014-63532

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing: DEFAULT JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2014-79164

Motion for Default Judgment

Motion for Default Judgment

Judgment Not Entered

Judgment Not Entered: FORCIBLE DEFAULT JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2014-82722

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Not Entered: FORCIBLE DEFAULT JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2014-82722

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing: DEFAULT JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2014-79164

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT, DEFUALT JUDGMENT, NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Fax Confirmation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Paid Forcible

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: JP APPEALED LETTER FROM COUNTY CLERK Film code number CCCL-2014-63582

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Citation: LISSELOTTE ORTIZ Film code number CCCL-2014-63532

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Citation: OSCAR ORTIZ Film code number CCCL-2014-63529

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Receipts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JP Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Pro Se Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Pro Se Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • Pro Se Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melamed, Richard