This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/25/2021 at 16:27:06 (UTC).

ANGELA WILLIAMS VS KROGER TEXAS, L.P.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 ANGELA WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KROGER TEXAS, L P. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1237

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Williams

Defendant

Kroger Texas, L.P.

C/O Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent 211 E. Seventh Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Not Classified By Court

SHERRA V. GILBERT

Houston, TX 77007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAIRD, KENNETH R.

Attorney at THE BAIRD LAW FIRM

2323 South Voss Road, Suite 325

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorney

AKERS, BROCK C

Attorney at THE AKERS FIRM, PLLC

3401 Allen Parkway, Suite 101

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

First Amended Original Answer

Amended Answer: Defendant's First Amended Original Answer

Initial Disclosures.pdf

Notice: Defendant's Initial Disclosures

Request for Disclosure.pdf

Request for Disclosure

Request for Production

Request for Production: Defendant's Request for Production to Plaintiff

Rogs to Plaintiff.doc.pdf

Request: Defendant's First Request for Production to Plaintiff

Return of Service

Return of Service: Return of Service P285053_001.pdf

Jury Demand.pdf

Jury Fee: Defendant's Application and Demand for Trial by Jury

Original Answer

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

AW - Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition: & CITATION TO BE ISSUED (JURY FEE PAID)

AW - Process Request.pdf

eFile Original Petition: & CITATION TO BE ISSUED (JURY FEE PAID)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer: Defendant's First Amended Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Defendant's Initial Disclosures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production: Defendant's Request for Production to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: Defendant's First Request for Production to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Fee: Defendant's Application and Demand for Trial by Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: Return of Service P285053_001.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: & CITATION TO BE ISSUED (JURY FEE PAID)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKERS, BROCK C.