Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/12/2021 at 15:02:29 (UTC).

ANGEL RIVERA VS KEIRRI J. FIRST

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 ANGEL RIVERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KEIRRI J FIRST. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6065

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angel Rivera

Defendant

Keirri J. First

2234 Fairgreen Drive

Missouri City, TX 77489

Not Classified By Court

ANDREW PAUL TOUBIN

Bellaire, TX 77401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACEVEDO, KEVIN

Attorney at GONZALEZ LAW GROUP PLLC

7151 Office City Drive Ste. 200

Houston, TX 77087

Defendant Attorney

Taylor, Alexander S

Attorney at Hope & Causey P.C

P.O.Box 3188

Conroe, TX 77305-3188

 

Court Documents

DEF'S OA.pdf

Answer: (JURY FEE PAID)

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

KEIRRI FIRST.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Civil Process Request Form (Harris County Court).pdf

eFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition (JURY FEE PAID)

2021.03.09 Plaintiffs Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition (JURY FEE PAID)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: (JURY FEE PAID)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition (JURY FEE PAID)

    Read MoreRead Less