This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/11/2021 at 14:58:03 (UTC).

ANGEL BRITO,CARMELA BRITO VS ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 ANGEL BRITO,CARMELA BRITO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGE BARNSTONE and AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6300

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

GEORGE BARNSTONE

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANGEL BRITO

CARMELA BRITO

Defendant

ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Ct Corporation System 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

Not Classified By Court

JEFFREY R. NEWPORT

Houston, TX 77024

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DICK, ERIC

3701 Brookwoods Drive

Houston, TX 77092

Defendant Attorney

Blum, Kimberly

Attorney at Susan L. Florence & Associates

811 Louisiana St Ste 2400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

A. Brito - Pltf Original Petition w Exhibits.pdf

eFile Original Petition

A. Brito - Civil Process Req Form.pdf

eFile Original Petition

A. Brito - Civil Case Info Sheet.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Brito_Notice to State Court.pdf

Other Dispositions: Notice of Removal

Brito_Notice to State Court_EXHIBIT 1.pdf

Other Dispositions: Notice of Removal

Brito_Notice to State Court.pdf

Notice: NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL

Brito_Notice to State Court_EXHIBIT 1.pdf

Notice: NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

104 Ans_CAT_L Brito.pdf

Answer: DEFENDANT S ORIGINAL ANSWER (JURY FEE PAID)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOther Dispositions: Notice of Removal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: DEFENDANT S ORIGINAL ANSWER (JURY FEE PAID)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blum, Kimberly