This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/25/2023 at 21:18:37 (UTC).

ANDRE GALLOWAY VS JOHNNIE MARION, JR.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 ANDRE GALLOWAY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHNNIE MARION, JR. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3596

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andre Galloway

Defendant

Johnnie Marion, Jr.

Houston, TX 77004

Not Classified By Court

Texas Volunteer Mediator Association

P.O. Box 3385

Houston, TX 77253

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Deyon, Derek H

Attorney at The Deyon Law Group, PLLC

440 Louisiana St., Ste. 900

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

MADDEN , DANIEL JOSEPH

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

2501 N Harwood, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

plaintiff.original.petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

civil.process.request.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: Civil Process Request

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

20221219Ds Answer and Affirmative Defenses

Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

return.of.service.PDF

Return of Service

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Order of Referral - Unclaimed

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Order for Trial Setting - Unclaimed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Order for Trial Setting - Unclaimed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Order of Referral - Unclaimed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: Civil Process Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Texas Volunteer Mediator Association is a litigant