This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/31/2022 at 17:06:36 (UTC).

AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION VS BRAZO PHARMACY LLC,TAREK HASSAN

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRAZO PHARMACY LLC,TAREK HASSAN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4093

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION

Defendants

BRAZO PHARMACY LLC

5150 Hidalgo St Ste 1906

Houston, TX 77056

TAREK HASSAN

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOTZ, ANDREW B.

Attorney at Totz Ellison Totz

2211 Norfolk, Suite 510

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

105491 Service of process letter-LLC.pdf

Letter: Service of process letter-llc

105491 Service of process letter-reg agent.pdf

Letter: Service of process letter-reg agent

105491 Service of process letter-LR, mgr & director.pdf

Letter: Service of process letter-LR, mgr and director

105491 Service of process letter-BY, mgr & director.pdf

Letter: Service of process letter-BY, mgr and director

105491 Service return-llc.pdf

Citation Returned: SOS

105491 First Amended Petition.pdf

Amended Petition: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

105491 Clerk letter.pdf

Rule 106 Citation to be Issued: See Letter

105491 Motion for Substitute Service.pdf

Motion for Substituted Service: Plaintiff's Motion for Substitute Service

105491 Order.pdf

Proposed Order: Order

106-Sent to Judge

Order for Rule 106

Rule 106 Citation

Rule 106 Citation Issued: P/UP CABINET LOOP LEGAL

First Amended Petition Citation

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: P/UP CABINET LOOP LEGAL

105491 Service Return.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: P/UP CABINET LOOP LEGAL FOLDER

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: P/UP CABINET LOOP LEGAL FOLDER

105491 Plaintiff's Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

105491 Case Info Sheet.pdf

Civil Case Information Sheet

105491 Clerk letter.pdf

Letter

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Service of process letter-llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Service of process letter-reg agent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Service of process letter-LR, mgr and director

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Service of process letter-BY, mgr and director

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: SOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 106 Citation Issued: P/UP CABINET LOOP LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Citation Issued: P/UP CABINET LOOP LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 106 Citation to be Issued: See Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service: Plaintiff's Motion for Substitute Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: P/UP CABINET LOOP LEGAL FOLDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: P/UP CABINET LOOP LEGAL FOLDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOTZ, ANDREW B.