Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/15/2019 at 22:36:19 (UTC).

AMERICAN FIRE PROTECTION GROUP INC. VS NATIONAL SIGNS, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 AMERICAN FIRE PROTECTION GROUP INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NATIONAL SIGNS, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3025

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN FIRE PROTECTION GROUP INC.

Defendant

NATIONAL SIGNS, LLC

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOTZ, JON D

Attorney at TOTZ ELLISON & TOTZ PC

2211 Norfolk, Suite #510

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

99359 Clerk letter.pdf

Letter: Cover Letter

99359 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss.pdf

Motion to Dismiss

99359 Order.pdf

Proposed Order: Order to Dismiss

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: LOOP LEGAL

99359 Plaintiff's Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

99359 Clerk letter.pdf

Letter

99359 County Civil Info Sheet.pdf

Civil Case Information Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order: Order to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: LOOP LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • eFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Original Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL SIGNS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOTZ, JON D