This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 17:27:59 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS WILLIAM JORDAN

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAM JORDAN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6634

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

William Jordan

Humble, TX 77346

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

Defendant Attorney

BELL, KATHERYN COLE

4401 Nw 4Th Street, Suite 109

Lahoma City, OK 73107

 

Court Documents

5502699-36739241-SO3TRxjVPq3SRsj.pdf

Return of Service

20200204_AMEX_JORDAN,WILLIAM_RULE 11.pdf

Rule 11 Agreement

20.02.07 JOrdan OA.pdf

Answer

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: MAIL TO EZM

5502699-36239731-Unfiled Original Petition-EtwabugbduOksAx.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502699_wK1atI3R2WDddPw.pdf

Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: MAIL TO EZM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less