This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 23:07:59 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS ROBERT MCCARTY

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERT MCCARTY. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6536

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

Defendant

ROBERT MCCARTY

Cypress, TX 77433

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garza, Kyle Kasner

15660 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant Attorney

GILPIN , PATRICK JOSEPH, Jr.

Attorney at GILPIN LAW FIRM

1400 Broadfield Blvd., Ste 200

Houston, TX 77084

 

Court Documents

5503995-36748023-Motion File Pack-tUlretvvI8DNOb2.pdf

Motion for Substituted Service

5503995 Order.pdf

Order for Rule 106

5503995-36978128-PEGOvuzSBX6kdtd.pdf

Return of Service: 5503995 Affidavit File Pack

DOA - JP.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

5503995-36256099-HXjywoSExU6ST1i.pdf

eFile Original Petition

5503995-36256628-8aIEGFBrymXOItO.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: 5503995 Affidavit File Pack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less