This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 17:32:43 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS RENAUD HARRIS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RENAUD HARRIS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6535

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

Defendant

RENAUD HARRIS

Houston, TX 77006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garza, Kyle Kasner

15660 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

 

Court Documents

3605448.pdf

Notice of Trial From Party

5503839-37671413-Lvsz3EKl4NdplGd.pdf

Citation Returned

Alias Citation

Alias Citation Issued: M/O EZ

5503839 CPR.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

5503839 aff.pdf

Citation Returned: Unserved

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: m/o ez

5503839-36255643-Z1LVj6pFnScvpRa.pdf

eFile Original Petition

5503839-36256620-77K6SbYGzhza8BS.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Trial From Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Citation Issued: M/O EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: m/o ez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less