This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/31/2020 at 14:37:37 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS PATRICK HAYES

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PATRICK HAYES. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6618

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

PATRICK HAYES

Houston, TX 77095

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

Defendant Attorney

Niba, Jacqueline

Attorney at National Litigation Law Group

2401 Northwest Twenty-Third Street Ste 42

Lahoma, OK 73107

 

Court Documents

20200417_AMEX_HAYES,PATRICK_PLT MTN TO DWOP.pdf

Motion to Dismiss: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

20200417_AMEX_HAYES,PATRICK_PLT PROPOSED ORDER TO DWOP.pdf

Proposed Order: PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

20200417_AMEX_HAYES,PATRICK_PLT PROPOSED ORDER TO DWOP.pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

5502668-36733861-Motion File Pack-IpZbp7h8DCLBsWS.PDF

Motion for Substituted Service

5502668_KZbemKmnttm0XLG.pdf

Proposed Order

5502668_KZbemKmnttm0XLG.pdf

Order for Rule 106

5502668-37028707-LBokg1T32xeFUIi.pdf

Return of Service

Patrick D Hayes-American Express National Bank-2003 Answer.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

5502668-36239510-Unfiled Original Petition-liCrpSQTI84OMSn.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502668_Y7kK6gSuMiphfZB.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less