This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 15:59:25 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS KURTIS FINTEL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KURTIS FINTEL. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6635

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

KURTIS FINTEL

Tomball, TX 77377

Not Classified By Court

DOUGLAS B. WILSON

Houston, TX 77058

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

Defendant Attorney

BELL, KATHERYN COLE

4401 Nw 4Th Street, Suite 109

Lahoma City, OK 73107

 

Court Documents

20200219 AMEX FINTEL KURTIS DWOP_20200219135048.pdf

Motion to Dismiss

20200219 AMEX FINTEL KURTIS DWOP1_20200219135058.pdf

Proposed Order

20200219 AMEX FINTEL KURTIS DWOP1_20200219135058.pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

19.12.30 Fintel OA.pdf

Answer: Defendant s Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff s Original Petition

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

5502709 AFF.pdf

Citation Returned: Unserved

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5502709-36239811-Unfiled Original Petition-XFoBIT4RyDzfhKA.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502709_ZKamd0fO0yh4Hsg.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant s Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff s Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less