This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/19/2021 at 16:16:21 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS JENNIFER RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JENNIFER RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2170

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

Defendant

Jennifer Rodriguez

Houston, TX 77042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOY, MEGAN

14090 S W Freeway, Suite 408

Sugar Land, TX 77478

Defendant Attorney

BELL, KATHERYN COLE

933 Nw 16Th St. Ste 2

Edmond, OK 73013

 

Court Documents

21.08.26 ANS_RODRIGUEZ.J.pdf

Answer

Lead_ProofofServiceorNonService_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: m/o abc

Zwicker_5686871_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Zwicker_5686871_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: m/o abc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katheryn Cole Bell