This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/29/2020 at 14:47:50 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS DANIEL HOWELL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DANIEL HOWELL. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6641

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

DANIEL HOWELL

Cypress, TX 77429

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

 

Court Documents

5502728-36826951-Motion File Pack-v76xwGWIOWzfRrG.PDF

Motion for Substituted Service

5502728_vOvvNmaXwHjKvvT.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

5502728_vOvvNmaXwHjKvvT.pdf

Order for Rule 106

5502728-37245518-UAuVYQDemrz1eXL.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

5502728-36239930-Unfiled Original Petition-p6qAdPXvjWk7LVB.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502728_eMcaAsqVTJWIjek.pdf

Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less