This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/10/2020 at 19:54:34 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS CURTRICIA ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CURTRICIA ALEXANDER. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6660

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

CURTRICIA ALEXANDER

Houston, TX 77073

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

5502721-36731142-CmDLTBesHs2g6TL.pdf

Return of Service

5502721-36731142-smBOxrz5UHdoQqg.pdf

Return of Service: 5502721 Affidavit File Pack

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5502721-36239876-Unfiled Original Petition-2vUbNvwBO3DknQN.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502721_JAM6hMUNLEFbSS3.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: *owes copies*

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: 5502721 Affidavit File Pack

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less