This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/02/2020 at 00:38:07 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS BRITTANI DAVIS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRITTANI DAVIS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6628

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

BRITTANI DAVIS

La Porte, TX 77571

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

 

Court Documents

20200316 AMEX DAVIS BRITTANI DWOP _20200316122155.pdf

Motion to Dismiss

20200316 AMEX DAVIS BRITTANI DWOP 1_20200316122202.pdf

Proposed Order: Proposed Order Granting Dismissal

Non Suit- Sent to Judge

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

5502690 aff.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5502690-36239660-Unfiled Original Petition-i2qfi2pDIaA0NMm.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502690_BDk3Gdkb6fcHU0d.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Proposed Order Granting Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less