This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/03/2020 at 15:27:54 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS ADELA FRANCO

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ADELA FRANCO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6636

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

Adela Franco

Houston, TX 77045

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

 

Court Documents

dj.franco.ord_20200317084522.pdf

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

dj.franco.m5n_20200317084409.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment: Motion for Default Judgment

dj.franco.exh_20200317084426.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment: Motion for Default Judgment

dj.franco.ord_20200317084522.pdf

Proposed Order: Default Judgment

5502710 AFF.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

5502710-36239824-Unfiled Original Petition-xh3SzpD0Vax7qpQ.PDF

eFile Original Petition

5502710_ZSALU8Wtnc7YmGX.pdf

Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment: Motion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less