This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 12/17/2021 at 16:06:39 (UTC).

ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS WATTS REGULATOR CO.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against WATTS REGULATOR CO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0572

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Defendant

Watts Regulator Co.

C/O Ct Corporation System 1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Not Classified By Court

MICHAEL A HAWASH

Houston, TX 77019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIGUSHIN, PAUL

Attorney at LAW OFFC OF PAUL VIGUSHIN

2201 N. Central Expy., Ste. 115

Richardson, TX 75080

Defendant Attorney

CRAIG, MARK TRAMMELL

Attorney at Settle Pou

3333 Lee Parkway Eighth Floor

Dallas, TX 75219

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Cancellation of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: Citation Request Form

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WATTS REGULATOR CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARK T CRAIG