This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/13/2022 at 15:00:28 (UTC).

ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS JONES STEPHENS CORP.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JONES STEPHENS CORP. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MIRYEA AYALA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7488

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MIRYEA AYALA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company

Defendants

Jones Stephens Corp.

3249 Moody Pkwy

Moody, AL 35004

Watts Regulator Co.

C/O Ct Corporation System, 1999 Bryan St., Ste. 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vigushin, Paul

Attorney at LAW OFFC OF PAUL VIGUSHIN

2201 N. Central Expy., Ste. 115

Richardson, TX 75080

 

Court Documents

Citation Request Form.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: Citation Request Form

Original Petition - pv - 6-29-22.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

First Amended Petition Citation

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

First Amended Petition Citation

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Citation Request Form - Watts.pdf

Amended Citation to be Issued: Request for Issuance - Watts

Citation Request Form - Jones Stephens.pdf

Amended Citation to be Issued: Request for Issuance - Jones Stephens

First Amended Petition - pv - 7-5-22.pdf

Amended Petition: First

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Citation to be Issued: Request for Issuance - Jones Stephens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Citation to be Issued: Request for Issuance - Watts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: Citation Request Form

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WATTS REGULATOR CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Vigushin